WI AB729 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 121.91 (4) (s) of the statutes; Relating to: revenue limit adjustment for certain school district workforce development improvements. (FE)
Title
Revenue limit adjustment for certain school district workforce development improvements. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative Vruwink added as a coauthor |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-12-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab729 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB729.pdf |