WI AB723 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 66.1105 (6) (e) 1. f. of the statutes; Relating to: authorizing the village of Biron to allocate positive tax increments from Tax Incremental District Number 2 in the village to Tax Incremental District Number 3 in the village. (FE)
Title
Authorizing the village of Biron to allocate positive tax increments from Tax Incremental District Number 2 in the village to Tax Incremental District Number 3 in the village. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 284 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-03-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State and Local Finance, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State and Local Finance |
2014-02-03 | House | Introduced |