WI AB720 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Published 3-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 441.06 (4) and 448.61; and to create 440.077, 448.03 (2) (bm) and 448.40 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: practice of certain skilled health services by military medical personnel and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Practice of certain skilled health services by military medical personnel and granting rule-making authority. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-08HousePublished 3-9-2022
2022-03-08HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-8-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 158
2022-03-03HousePresented to the Governor on 3-3-2022
2022-01-31HouseReport correctly enrolled on 1-31-2022
2022-01-25HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2022-01-25SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2022-01-25SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2022-01-25SenateRules suspended
2022-01-25SenateOrdered to a third reading
2022-01-25SenateRead a second time
2022-01-21SenatePlaced on calendar 1-25-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2022-01-21SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2022-01-21SenateAvailable for scheduling
2022-01-21SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2022-01-20SenateReceived from Assembly
2022-01-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2022-01-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2022-01-20HouseRules suspended
2022-01-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2022-01-20HouseAssembly Amendment 2 adopted
2022-01-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2022-01-20HouseRead a second time
2022-01-18HousePlaced on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules
2022-01-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2022-01-18HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2022-01-18HouseReport Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2022-01-18HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2022-01-18HouseRepresentative Cabrera added as a coauthor
2022-01-13HouseRepresentative Penterman added as a coauthor
2022-01-12HouseExecutive action taken
2022-01-12HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Summerfield
2022-01-06HouseRepresentatives Rozar, Dittrich, Magnafici and Wichgers added as coauthors
2022-01-06HousePublic hearing held
2022-01-05HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Summerfield
2021-12-08HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-11-24HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-11-18HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2021-11-18HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab720
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/AB720.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/enrolledbills/2021/REG/AB720.pdf
Texthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/acts/2021/158.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/AB720-AA1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/amends/2021/REG/AB720-AA2.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/fe/ab720/ab720_dva.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/fe/ab720/ab720_dsps.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/related/records/assembly/health/1653305.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcamendmentmemos/2021/REG/AB720.pdf
Supplementhttps://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/lcactmemos/2021/REG/Act%20158.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback