WI AB714 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.235 (1) (e) (title), 20.285 (1) (gb), 39.42, 39.47 (title), 39.47 (1), 39.47 (2), 45.20 (2) (a) 1., 45.20 (2) (c) 1., 45.20 (2) (d) 1. (intro.), 71.05 (6) (b) 28. (intro.) and 321.40 (1) (c) 2.; and to create 36.27 (2r) of the statutes; Relating to: the Minnesota-Wisconsin tuition reciprocity agreement and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
The Minnesota-Wisconsin tuition reciprocity agreement and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-01-25 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2022-01-20 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2022-01-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-12-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-12-06 | House | Representative James added as a coauthor |
2021-11-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2021-11-16 | House | Introduced |