WI AB71 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 115.28 (63) of the statutes; Relating to: an inventory of pupil data.
Title
An inventory of pupil data.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-08-17 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a second time |
2017-06-14 | House | Placed on calendar 6-21-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-04-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-03-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-17 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab71 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB71.pdf |