WI AB703 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.285 (1) (ar); and to create 36.25 (56) of the statutes; Relating to: the University of Wisconsin System freshwater collaborative. (FE)
Title
The University of Wisconsin System freshwater collaborative. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Elijah Behnke [R] | Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] |
Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-12-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2021-11-12 | House | Introduced |