WI AB687 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Fiscal estimate received
Pending: House Labor and Integrated Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 7.33 (4), 13.111 (2), 16.50 (3) (e), 19.82 (1), 19.85 (3), 19.86, 20.425 (1) (a), 20.425 (1) (i), 20.505 (1) (ks), 20.505 (1) (kz), 20.917 (3) (b), 20.921 (1) (a) 2., 20.923 (6) (intro.), 36.09 (1) (j), 40.02 (25) (b) 8., 40.05 (4g) (a) 4., 40.80 (3), 40.81 (3), 111.70 (1) (a), 111.70 (1) (fm), 111.70 (1) (j), 111.70 (3) (a) 5., 111.70 (3) (a) 6., 111.70 (4) (cg) (title), 1. to 5. and 6. a., 111.70 (4) (cg) 7r. d., 111.70 (4) (cg) 7r. e., 111.70 (4) (cg) 7r. f., 111.70 (4) (cg) 7r. h., 111.70 (4) (cg) 8m., 111.70 (4) (d) 1., 111.70 (4) (d) 2. a., 111.70 (4) (p), 111.70 (7m) (c) 1. a., 111.81 (1), 111.81 (9g), 111.81 (12m), 111.81 (16), 111.825 (5), 111.83 (1), 111.83 (5) (d), 111.83 (5) (e), 111.83 (5) (f), 111.84 (1) (f), 111.85 (1) (a), 111.85 (1) (b), 111.85 (1) (c), 111.85 (1) (d), 111.85 (2) (a), 111.85 (2) (b), 111.85 (4), 111.91 (1) (a), 111.91 (1) (b), 111.91 (1) (c), 111.93 (3) (a), 230.01 (3), 230.046 (10) (a), 230.12 (3) (e) 1., 230.35 (2d) (e), 230.35 (3) (e) 6. and 230.88 (2) (b); and to create 111.70 (1) (cn), 111.70 (1) (om) and subchapter VI of chapter 111 [precedes 111.95] of the statutes; Relating to: collective bargaining for employees of school districts, employees of cooperative educational service agencies, employees of technical college districts, and employees of the University of Wisconsin System and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collective bargaining for employees of school districts, employees of cooperative educational service agencies, employees of technical college districts, and employees of the University of Wisconsin System and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-30HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-11-30HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-11-24HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-11-23HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-11-12HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment
2021-11-12HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback