WI AB684 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.235 (1) (a) and 39.49 of the statutes; Relating to: veteran-related tuition grants for certain veterans and dependents enrolled in private nonprofit institutions of higher education and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Veteran-related tuition grants for certain veterans and dependents enrolled in private nonprofit institutions of higher education and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2020-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-19 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:34 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | Representative Ott added as a coauthor |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2020-02-10 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 15, Noes 1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Representative Wittke added as a coauthor |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kurtz |
2020-01-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2019-12-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab684 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB684.pdf |