WI AB681 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 100.70 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting the sale of dextromethorphan without a prescription to persons under 18 and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the sale of dextromethorphan without a prescription to persons under 18 and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HousePublished 3-29-2018
2018-03-28HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 160
2018-03-27HousePresented to the Governor on 3-27-2018
2018-03-26HouseReport correctly enrolled on 3-26-2018
2018-03-21HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-03-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-03-20SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2018-03-20SenateRules suspended
2018-03-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-03-20SenateRead a second time
2018-03-15SenatePlaced on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-03-15SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2018-03-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-03-12SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20HouseRepresentatives Barca and Shankland added as coauthors
2018-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2018-02-20HouseRules suspended
2018-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2018-02-20HouseRead a second time
2018-02-15HouseMade a special order of business at 1:34 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26
2018-01-05HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-01-05HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2018-01-05HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2017-12-27HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-12-20HouseExecutive action taken
2017-12-18HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kremer
2017-12-13HousePublic hearing held
2017-11-29HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2017-11-29HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback