WI AB67 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Representative Doyle added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 165.77 (7) and 175.405; to amend 165.845 (title), 165.845 (1) (a), 165.845 (1) (b) and 165.845 (2); and to create 165.775, 165.845 (1) (d) and 895.537 of the statutes; Relating to: storage and processing of sexual assault kits and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Storage and processing of sexual assault kits and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Representative Doyle added as a coauthor |
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Representative Anderson added as a coauthor |
2021-11-11 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2021-11-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-02 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen |
2021-10-14 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2021-10-11 | House | Representative Shelton added as a coauthor |
2021-10-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-06 | House | Senator Jacque added as a cosponsor |
2021-10-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-09-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen |
2021-09-29 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2021-02-17 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2021-02-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced |