WI AB67 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Published 2-6-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 115.385 (1) (d) 6. and 115.385 (1g) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: information on the school district and school accountability report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Information on the school district and school accountability report.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HousePublished 2-6-2020
2020-02-06HouseReport approved by the Governor on 2-5-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 85
2020-02-03HousePresented to the Governor on 2-3-2020
2020-01-27HouseReport correctly enrolled on 1-27-2020
2020-01-21HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-01-21SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2020-01-21SenateRules suspended
2020-01-21SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-01-21SenateRead a second time
2020-01-17SenatePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2019-09-17SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-09-17SenateReport concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 1
2019-09-17SenateExecutive action taken
2019-08-13SenatePublic hearing held
2019-06-24SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Education
2019-06-18SenateReceived from Assembly
2019-06-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-06-18HouseRead a third time and passed
2019-06-18HouseRules suspended
2019-06-18HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-06-18HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2019-06-18HouseRead a second time
2019-06-13HouseRepresentative Allen added as a coauthor
2019-06-13HousePlaced on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-04-29HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-04-29HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 1
2019-04-29HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2019-04-18HouseExecutive action taken
2019-04-17HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens
2019-04-04HouseRepresentative Bowen added as a coauthor
2019-04-04HousePublic hearing held
2019-03-07HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback