WI AB669 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 23.33 (3c), 29.089 (2), 29.091 (2), 29.621 (4) (a) to (d), 167.31 (1) (cm) and (2) (a) and (b), 167.31 (3) (a) 2., 167.31 (4) (ag), 167.31 (4) (am) 2. and 3., 167.31 (4) (bg), (bn) and (bt), 167.31 (4) (cm) and (d), 173.07 (5) (b), 175.60 (1) (dm) and (h), 175.60 (2g), 175.60 (2m) (bm), 175.60 (11) (b) 2., 3. and 4., 175.60 (16), 175.60 (17) (a), (ac) and (b), 440.26 (3m), 941.23, 941.235, 941.237 (1) (a) to (dr) and (em) to (g), 941.237 (3), 948.605 (1) (ag) and (ar) and 973.137 (1); to renumber 175.60 (12) (b) 1. a. and b. and 943.13 (4m) (am); to renumber and amend 29.091 (1), 29.621 (4) (intro.), 167.31 (4) (am) 1., 175.60 (11) (b) 1., 175.60 (12) (b) 2., 175.60 (15m), 175.60 (21) (c) and 943.13 (4m) (bm); to consolidate, renumber and amend 167.31 (3) (a) (intro.) and 1. and 941.237 (1) (intro.) and (e); to amend 29.301 (1) (b), 29.314 (3) (title) and (a) and (4) (title) and (a), 110.07 (1) (a) 1. and 3. and (b), 167.31 (2) (c), 167.31 (2) (d), 167.31 (2) (e), 167.31 (4) (a) (intro.), 167.31 (4) (b), 167.31 (4) (c) and (cg) (intro.), 167.31 (4) (f), (i) and (j), 175.60 (2) (c), 175.60 (2m) (a), 175.60 (5) (a) (intro.), 175.60 (5) (a) 6., 175.60 (12) (a), 345.11 (1s), 345.20 (2) (f), 938.34 (14q), 938.78 (3), 939.632 (1) (e) 3., 941.237 (2), 941.295 (2g) (c), 941.299 (1) (a), 943.13 (1m) (c) 4., 948.605 (2) (b) 2d., 2f. and 2h. and (3) (b) 5., 6. and 7. and 968.255 (1) (a) 2.; and to create 66.0409 (2m), 167.31 (4) (a) 1. and 943.13 (1p) of the statutes; Relating to: right to carry a weapon in this state. (FE)
Title
Right to carry a weapon in this state. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-27 | House | Representative Schraa added as a coauthor |
2022-01-13 | House | Representative Pronschinske added as a coauthor |
2021-12-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-12-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2021-12-06 | House | LRB correction |
2021-11-11 | House | Representative Murphy added as a coauthor |
2021-11-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-11-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2021-10-29 | House | Introduced |