WI AB664 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to consolidate, renumber and amend 867.046 (2) (intro.), (a) and (b); and to amend 867.045 (1) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: obtaining evidence of the termination of certain property interests of a decedent.
Title
Obtaining evidence of the termination of certain property interests of a decedent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2018-01-23 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-01-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-11-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab664 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB664.pdf |