WI AB662 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.255 (3) (df); and to create 20.255 (3) (df) of the statutes; Relating to: an online early learning pilot program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
An online early learning pilot program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:29 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | LRB correction |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rules 24 (3)(a) |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Thiesfeldt and L. Myers |
2019-12-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-12-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-05 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Education |
2019-12-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab662 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB662.pdf |