WI AB66 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.380 (3) (dm) and 41.567 of the statutes; Relating to: creative economy development initiative grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creative economy development initiative grants and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-04-29 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Community Development, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2019-04-17 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2019-04-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-03-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-12 | House | Representatives Novak and Ramthun added as coauthors |
2019-03-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Community Development |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab66 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB66.pdf |