WI AB659 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: report on reducing the number of hunting, fishing, and trapping approvals required by the Department of Natural Resources. (FE)
Title
Report on reducing the number of hunting, fishing, and trapping approvals required by the Department of Natural Resources. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-08 | House | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor |
2021-11-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage |
2021-10-29 | House | Introduced |