WI AB658 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: Department of Natural Resources report on partnering with the private aquaculture industry. (FE)
Title
Department of Natural Resources report on partnering with the private aquaculture industry. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2022-02-01 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2022-01-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dallman |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-11-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2021-10-29 | House | Introduced |