WI AB654 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 628.347 (1) (e); to amend 628.347 (title), 628.347 (1) (b), 628.347 (3) (a) 4., 628.347 (3) (a) 5., 628.347 (3) (c), 628.347 (3m) (a) and 628.347 (4m) (b) 3. f.; to repeal and recreate 628.347 (2) and 628.347 (4); and to create 628.347 (1) (ac), 628.347 (1) (ae), 628.347 (1) (ag) 13. and 14., 628.347 (1) (ak), 628.347 (1) (ar), 628.347 (1) (aw), 628.347 (1) (ax), 628.347 (2b), 628.347 (2c), 628.347 (2d), 628.347 (2e), 628.347 (3) (a) 7., 8. and 9., 628.347 (3) (am), 628.347 (4m) (b) 10., 628.347 (4m) (b) 11. and 628.347 (9) and (10) of the statutes; Relating to: best interest in annuity transactions.
Title
Best interest in annuity transactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:36 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2022-01-26 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-26 | House | Representative Riemer added as a coauthor |
2022-01-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-10-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2021-10-25 | House | Introduced |