WI AB654 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: expanding telehealth mental health treatment to offenders under community supervision. (FE)
Title
Expanding telehealth mental health treatment to offenders under community supervision. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Ayes 9, Noes 2 |
2020-01-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-12-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-12-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health |
2019-12-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab654 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB654.pdf |