WI AB639 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 51.428 of the statutes; Relating to: pilot program for reimbursement of certain costs relating to hospitalization for purposes of emergency detention. (FE)
Title
Pilot program for reimbursement of certain costs relating to hospitalization for purposes of emergency detention. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Stafsholt [R] | Rep. Gae Magnafici [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] | Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R] |
Rep. Warren Petryk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Senator Schachtner added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:24 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Ayes 7, Noes 4 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Stafsholt |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab639 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB639.pdf |