WI AB636 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.380 (3) (dm) and 41.567 of the statutes; Relating to: a grant program to support creative industries, job creation, or economic development in this state and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A grant program to support creative industries, job creation, or economic development in this state and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-12 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-01-29 | House | Representative Sargent added as a coauthor |
2016-01-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-20 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2016-01-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-14 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2016-01-11 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2016-01-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab636 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB636.pdf |