WI AB634 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 757.69 (1) (p) 1. of the statutes; Relating to: allowing a court commissioner to address stipulated final legal separation hearings.
Title
Allowing a court commissioner to address stipulated final legal separation hearings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2022-01-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-12-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-11-03 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2021-10-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2021-10-21 | House | Introduced |