WI AB634 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 165.505 (1) (a) and 165.505 (1) (b); to renumber and amend 165.505 (2), 165.505 (3), 165.505 (4) and 165.505 (5); to amend 165.505 (title), 165.505 (1) (intro.), 165.505 (6), 165.505 (7) (intro.) and 165.505 (8); and to create 165.505 (1) (ag), 165.505 (1) (am) and 165.505 (3j) of the statutes; Relating to: administrative subpoenas for the investigation of human trafficking crimes and Internet crimes against children.
Title
Administrative subpoenas for the investigation of human trafficking crimes and Internet crimes against children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:06 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-06 | House | Representative Tusler added as a coauthor |
2018-01-26 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-24 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 1 |
2018-01-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Goyke |
2018-01-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke |
2017-11-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-11-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab634 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB634.pdf |