WI AB633 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 767.54; to amend 767.553 (1) (c); and to create 767.54 (1) (a) to (d) and 767.54 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: the required annual exchange of financial information in an order for family support, child support, or maintenance.
Title
The required annual exchange of financial information in an order for family support, child support, or maintenance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2022-01-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-12-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-10-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2021-10-21 | House | Introduced |