WI AB632 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 118.016 (1) (a); to amend 118.016 (1) (b); and to create 118.016 (1) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: assessments to evaluate reading readiness. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assessments to evaluate reading readiness. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2020-02-12HousePublic hearing held
2019-12-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-12-02HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback