WI AB630 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 49.45 (9r) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: reimbursement under the Medical Assistance program for complex rehabilitation technology wheelchair repairs and accessories. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reimbursement under the Medical Assistance program for complex rehabilitation technology wheelchair repairs and accessories. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-03-07HouseRepresentative Shankland added as a coauthor
2024-02-22HouseLaid on the table
2024-02-20HouseMade a special order of business at 10:25 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
2024-02-14HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2024-02-14HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 11, Noes 0
2024-02-13HouseExecutive action taken
2024-01-11HousePublic hearing held
2023-12-15HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-11-08HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Insurance
2023-11-08HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback