WI AB625 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal and recreate 3.11 to 3.18 of the statutes; Relating to: congressional redistricting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congressional redistricting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2021-11-11HouseLaid on the table
2021-11-09HousePlaced on calendar 11-11-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-11-09HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-11-09HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 4
2021-11-08HouseExecutive action taken
2021-10-28HousePublic hearing held
2021-10-21HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
2021-10-21HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback