WI AB619 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.05 (1) (bn) of the statutes; Relating to: charitable donations to the family of a law enforcement officer or fire fighter killed in the line of duty. (FE)
Title
Charitable donations to the family of a law enforcement officer or fire fighter killed in the line of duty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-12-13 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2017-11-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-11-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-11-09 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab619 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB619.pdf |