WI AB61 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 23.15 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: the use of proceeds from the sale of state-owned properties controlled by the Department of Natural Resources. (FE)
Title
The use of proceeds from the sale of state-owned properties controlled by the Department of Natural Resources. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-04-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar 4-13-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-04-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2021-04-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2021-04-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-03-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-03-30 | House | Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a coauthor |
2021-03-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens |
2021-03-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-02-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced |