WI AB594 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 253.135 of the statutes; Relating to: congenital condition educational resources. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congenital condition educational resources. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2021-10-27HouseRepresentative Tittl added as a coauthor
2021-10-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-10-26HouseRepresentative Steffen added as a coauthor
2021-10-25HouseRepresentative Thiesfeldt added as a coauthor
2021-10-21HousePlaced on calendar 10-27-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-10-20HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-10-20HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 10, Noes 3
2021-10-19HouseExecutive action taken
2021-10-12HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-10-07HousePublic hearing held
2021-10-05HouseRepresentatives Born, Krug and Wichgers added as coauthors
2021-10-04HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health
2021-10-04HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback