WI AB585 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 115.787 (2) (i), 118.305 (6) (a) 1. and 118.305 (6) (a) 3.; to renumber and amend 118.305 (1) (d), 118.305 (3) (f), 118.305 (4) (b) and 118.305 (5); to amend 118.305 (1) (f), 118.305 (2) (f), 118.305 (4) (a) (intro.), 118.305 (4) (a) 2. (intro.), 118.305 (4) (a) 2. d., 118.305 (4) (c) (intro.), 118.305 (4) (c) 1., 118.305 (4) (c) 2., 118.305 (6) (a) (intro.), 118.305 (6) (a) 6., 118.305 (6) (b) 1. and 118.305 (6) (c); and to create 118.305 (1) (d) 2., 118.305 (1) (dm), 118.305 (1) (ek), 118.305 (1) (em), 118.305 (3) (d) 4., 118.305 (3) (f) 2., 118.305 (4) (a) 3., 118.305 (4) (b) 2., 118.305 (4) (c) 3. to 6., 118.305 (4) (cm), 118.305 (4) (d), 118.305 (4) (e), 118.305 (5) (b), 118.305 (6) (a) 1f. and 118.305 (6) (a) 1m. of the statutes; Relating to: the seclusion and physical restraint of pupils.
Title
The seclusion and physical restraint of pupils.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-12-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-11-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2019-11-01 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab585 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB585.pdf |