WI AB576 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 29.630 and 29.709 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: raffling lake sturgeon culled from state fish hatcheries. (FE)
Title
Raffling lake sturgeon culled from state fish hatcheries. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:27 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 13, Noes 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-01-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Thiesfeldt |
2022-01-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-09-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage |
2021-09-22 | House | Introduced |