WI AB570 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 703.15 (2) (a), 703.20 (1) and 703.20 (2); to amend 703.02 (1m), 703.15 (2) (a) (title), 703.20 (1) (title), 703.20 (3), 703.205 (1) (a) and 703.33 (title); to repeal and recreate 703.20 (title); and to create 703.15 (2) (a) 2., 703.15 (2) (a) 3., 703.20 (1) (a), 703.20 (1) (b) 2. to 9., 703.20 (1g), 703.20 (1r), 703.20 (4), 703.20 (5) and 703.202 of the statutes; Relating to: a condominium association's obligation to maintain records and allow a unit owner to inspect and copy those records; financial audits of condominium association records; access by condominium unit owners to records of an entity controlled by an association; and organizing a condominium association as a for-profit corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A condominium association's obligation to maintain records and allow a unit owner to inspect and copy those records; financial audits of condominium association records; access by condominium unit owners to records of an entity controlled by an association; and organizing a condominium association as a for-profit corporation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2022-02-23HouseLaid on the table
2022-02-22HouseMade a special order of business at 8:24 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29
2022-02-01HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2022-02-01HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 1
2022-02-01HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 1
2022-01-19HouseExecutive action taken
2022-01-13HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens
2022-01-05HousePublic hearing held
2021-09-22HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate
2021-09-22HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback