WI AB57 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Oldenburg
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 106.13 (2m); to amend 106.13 (1), 106.13 (2), 106.13 (3) and 106.13 (3m) (d); and to create 20.445 (1) (eg) and 106.13 (2m) (a), (b), (c) of the statutes; Relating to: youth apprenticeship programs and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth apprenticeship programs and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Oldenburg
2019-03-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-12HouseRepresentative Ohnstad added as a coauthor
2019-03-06HousePublic hearing held
2019-03-04HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development
2019-03-04HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback