WI AB564 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.932 of the statutes; Relating to: reports concerning state agency expenditure of federal coronavirus relief funds and allocating federal American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 funding for grants to school districts, independent charter schools, and private schools for mental health programs. (FE)
Title
Reports concerning state agency expenditure of federal coronavirus relief funds and allocating federal American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 funding for grants to school districts, independent charter schools, and private schools for mental health programs. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Plumer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-28 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations, Legal Review and Consumer Protection |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 38 |
2021-09-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-09-28 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-09-28 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 38 |
2021-09-28 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Vining, Considine, Moore Omokunde, Hesselbein, Emerson, Ohnstad, Subeck, McGuire, Hebl, Shelton, Stubbs, Snodgrass, Billings, Anderson, Cabrera, Baldeh and Neubauer |
2021-09-28 | House | Read a second time |
2021-09-27 | House | Representative Wittke added as a coauthor |
2021-09-23 | House | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-09-22 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Ayes 9, Noes 4 |
2021-09-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-09-21 | House | Representatives Cabral-Guevara, Snyder, James and Magnafici added as coauthors |
2021-09-21 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Vining, Considine, Brostoff and Moore Omokunde |
2021-09-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-09-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health |
2021-09-16 | House | Introduced |