WI AB564 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Published 5-19-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Published 5-19-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 183.0104 (2) and 183.0104 (4); and to create 183.0104 (1m) of the statutes; relating to: long-term name reservation by a limited liability company (suggested as remedial legislation by the Department of Financial Institutions).
Title
Long-term name reservation by a limited liability company (suggested as remedial legislation by the Department of Financial Institutions).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Published 5-19-2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-5-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 236 | |
2010-05-04 | Presented to the Governor on 5-4-2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-04-20 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-16 | Placed on calendar 4-20-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-16 | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m) | |
2010-04-14 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-14 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | |
2010-04-14 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-13 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-13 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on calendar 4-13-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-02-26 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-02-26 | Report passage recommended by committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 10, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-24 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-10 | Public hearing held | |
2009-11-10 | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions | |
2009-11-10 | Introduced |