WI AB560 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-3)
Status: Introduced on September 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-27 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 118.019 (2m) (j) of the statutes; Relating to: required subjects in a human growth and development instructional program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Required subjects in a human growth and development instructional program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-10-21HousePlaced on calendar 10-27-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-10-21HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-10-21HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2021-09-22HouseRepresentative Vruwink added as a coauthor
2021-09-22HouseExecutive action taken
2021-09-16HousePublic hearing held
2021-09-16HouseRepresentatives L. Myers and Ramthun added as coauthors
2021-09-10HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2021-09-10HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback