WI AB560 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 709.02 (2) (intro.) and 709.02 (2) (d) of the statutes; relating to: information related to condominiums that must be furnished with real estate condition reports.
Title
Information related to condominiums that must be furnished with real estate condition reports.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Rivard [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Rep. Jim Steineke [R] |
Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] | Sen. Alberta Darling [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-03-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-03-09 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Housing, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2012-03-09 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Housing, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2012-03-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-03-05 | House | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Rivard |
2012-02-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-02-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Housing |
2012-02-13 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab560 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB560.pdf |