WI AB559 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 100.52 (6); to amend 100.52 (10) (a) and 100.52 (10) (b); and to create 100.52 (1) (bd), 100.52 (4) (a) 4., 100.52 (4) (a) 5., 100.52 (6) (c), 100.52 (10) (c) and 100.523 of the statutes; Relating to: caller identification spoofing, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Caller identification spoofing, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-01-25HouseLaid on the table
2024-01-23HouseMade a special order of business at 10:22 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
2024-01-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2024-01-18HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2024-01-18HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 8, Noes 0
2024-01-17HouseExecutive action taken
2024-01-11HousePublic hearing held
2023-12-27HouseFiscal estimate received
2023-12-12HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bodden
2023-10-30HouseRepresentative Subeck added as a coauthor
2023-10-26HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection
2023-10-26HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback