WI AB556 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.05 (6) (b) 53. and 71.53 (2) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: creating an individual income tax deduction for certain income earned by an individual from the practice of psychiatry. (FE)
Title
Creating an individual income tax deduction for certain income earned by an individual from the practice of psychiatry. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Dave Considine [D] | Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] |
Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] | Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-03-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 7, Noes 4 |
2018-03-22 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 7, Noes 4 |
2018-02-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-25 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl |
2017-12-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-13 | House | Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor |
2017-11-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-10-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2017-10-19 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab556 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB556.pdf |