WI AB55 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 115.28 (55) (title); and to create 115.28 (55m), 118.40 (2r) (b) 2. L., 118.40 (2x) (b) 2. L., 118.60 (2) (a) 9., 119.23 (2) (a) 9. and 121.02 (1) (L) 8. of the statutes; Relating to: incorporating the Holocaust and other genocides into the state model social studies standards and requiring instruction on the Holocaust and other genocides. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Incorporating the Holocaust and other genocides into the state model social studies standards and requiring instruction on the Holocaust and other genocides. (FE)

Sponsors

Rep. Jon Plumer [R]Rep. Lisa Subeck [D]Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R]Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D]
Rep. Deb Andraca [D]Rep. Samba Baldeh [D]Rep. Jill Billings [D]Rep. David Bowen [D]
Rep. Ed Brooks [R]Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D]Rep. Marisabel Cabrera [D]Rep. Calvin Callahan [R]
Rep. Sue Conley [D]Rep. Dave Considine [D]Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R]Rep. Steve Doyle [D]
Rep. Dora Drake [D]Rep. Cindi Duchow [R]Rep. James Edming [R]Rep. Jodi Emerson [D]
Rep. Evan Goyke [D]Rep. Rick Gundrum [R]Rep. Gary Hebl [D]Rep. Gordon Hintz [D]
Rep. Dianne Hesselbein [D]Rep. Francesca Hong [D]Rep. Terry Katsma [R]Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R]
Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R]Rep. Dan Knodl [R]Rep. Gae Magnafici [R]Rep. Nick Milroy [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R]Rep. Beth Meyers [D]Rep. LaKeshia Myers [D]Rep. Greta Neubauer [D]
Rep. Todd Novak [R]Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D]Rep. Sylvia Ortiz-Velez [D]Rep. Treig Pronschinske [R]
Rep. Daniel Riemer [D]Rep. Jessie Rodriguez [R]Rep. Sara Rodriguez [D]Rep. Donna Rozar [R]
Rep. Michael Schraa [R]Rep. Katrina Shankland [D]Rep. Kristina Shelton [D]Rep. Christine Sinicki [D]
Rep. Lee Snodgrass [D]Rep. Patrick Snyder [R]Rep. John Spiros [R]Rep. Mark Spreitzer [D]
Rep. David Steffen [R]Rep. Shelia Stubbs [D]Rep. Gary Tauchen [R]Rep. Paul Tittl [R]
Rep. Ron Tusler [R]Rep. Robyn Vining [D]Rep. Robin Vos [R]Rep. Don Vruwink [D]
Rep. Chuck Wichgers [R]Sen. Alberta Darling [R]Sen. Melissa Sargent [D]Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D]
Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D]Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R]Sen. Dan Feyen [R]Sen. Andre Jacque [R]
Sen. LaTonya Johnson [D]Sen. Christopher Larson [D]Sen. Brad Pfaff [D]Sen. Janis Ringhand [D]
Sen. Kelda Roys [D]Sen. Van Wanggaard [R]Sen. Robert Wirch [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-13HouseRepresentatives August, Petryk, Vorpagel and Loudenbeck added as coauthors
2021-04-08HousePlaced on calendar 4-13-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-04-08HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2021-04-08HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2021-03-31HouseExecutive action taken
2021-03-10HousePublic hearing held
2021-03-04HouseRepresentative Ramthun added as a coauthor
2021-02-23HouseRepresentative Allen added as a coauthor
2021-02-23HouseFiscal estimate received
2021-02-10HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback