WI AB547 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 945.01 (1) (b); and to create chapter 570 of the statutes; Relating to: registration of fantasy contest operators, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Registration of fantasy contest operators, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Tyler Vorpagel [R] | Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] |
Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-11-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2019-10-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab547 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB547.pdf |