WI AB547 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Published 3-1-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 943.01 (2k) and 943.143 of the statutes; Relating to: trespass and damage to property owned or used by an energy provider and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Trespass and damage to property owned or used by an energy provider and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Bob Gannon [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] |
Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] |
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] | Rep. Warren Petryk [R] |
Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Rep. Michael Schraa [R] | Rep. Gary Tauchen [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] |
Rep. Thomas Weatherston [R] | Rep. Josh Zepnick [D] | Rep. John Macco [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] |
Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Richard Gudex [R] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Published 3-1-2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-29-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 158 |
2016-02-25 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2016 |
2016-02-19 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-19-2016 |
2016-02-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-11 | House | LRB correction (Senate Amendment 3) |
2016-02-10 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 20, Noes 12 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 19, Noes 13 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Vinehout, Miller, Risser, L. Taylor, Hansen, Wirch, Carpenter, C. Larson, Ringhand and Bewley |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Risser, L. Taylor, Vinehout and Ringhand |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-9-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators L. Taylor and Risser |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-01-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-12 | House | Representatives Shankland and Kolste added as coauthors |
2016-01-12 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-01-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-01-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-01-12 | House | Read a second time |
2016-01-12 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2016-01-07 | House | Placed on calendar 1-12-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2015-12-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-12-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2015-12-22 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-12-16 | House | LRB correction |
2015-12-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-12-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-12-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-12-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen |
2015-11-24 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2015-11-24 | House | Introduced |