WI AB542 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 146.348 of the statutes; Relating to: allowing reimbursement of certain expenses for patients participating in cancer clinical trials.
Title
Allowing reimbursement of certain expenses for patients participating in cancer clinical trials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-11-20 | House | Representative Snyder added as a coauthor |
2019-10-18 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2019-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-10-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab542 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB542.pdf |