WI AB530 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 69.18 (4) (bm), 979.01 (3), 979.01 (3m), 979.03 and 979.10 (3); to renumber 69.18 (4) (a) 1g. to 6.; to renumber and amend 69.18 (4) (a) (intro.), 157.02 (1), (2), (3), (4) and (5), 979.01 (1m), 979.01 (2), 979.01 (4), 979.02, 979.10 (1) (a) 1., 2. and 3. and 979.10 (1) (c); to amend 20.165 (1) (g), 69.01 (12), 69.18 (1) (a) 3., 69.18 (2) (d) 1., 69.18 (2) (d) 2., 69.18 (2) (d) 3., 69.18 (3) (a), 69.18 (3) (b), 69.18 (3) (d), 69.20 (2) (a) 2., 157.03 (1), 157.03 (2), 157.055 (2) (intro.), 157.112 (3) (intro.), 157.70 (3) (a), 346.71 (1), 346.71 (2), 440.03 (9) (a) (intro.), 440.05 (intro.), 440.78 (1) (b), 979.01 (title), 979.01 (1r), 979.015, 979.02 (title), 979.025 (title), 979.025 (1), 979.025 (2), 979.025 (3), 979.09, 979.10 (1) (a) (intro.), 979.10 (1) (b), 979.10 (2), 979.10 (4) and 979.22; to repeal and recreate 979.01 (1) and 979.01 (1g); and to create 15.405 (18), 20.165 (1) (b), 20.165 (1) (hr), 51.30 (4) (b) 29., 69.18 (4) (am) (intro.), 69.18 (4) (b), 69.18 (4) (d), 69.18 (4) (e), 69.18 (4) (f), 157.02 (1m) (title), 157.02 (2m), 440.03 (9) (bm), 440.03 (13) (b) 38m., 440.08 (2) (a) 46t., chapter 463, 979.001, 979.01 (1d), 979.01 (1i), 979.01 (1k), 979.01 (1m) (b), 979.01 (1p), 979.01 (2) (b), 979.017, 979.02 (2) to (7), 979.027, 979.032, 979.034, 979.036, 979.10 (1) (a) 1m. and 2m., 979.10 (1) (d), 979.10 (5) and 979.10 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: reporting deaths; death investigations and other duties of coroners and medical examiners; disposition of bodies; creating a medicolegal investigation examining board; licensure of coroners, medical examiners, and medicolegal investigation staff members; granting rule-making authority; making an appropriation; and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Reporting deaths; death investigations and other duties of coroners and medical examiners; disposition of bodies; creating a medicolegal investigation examining board; licensure of coroners, medical examiners, and medicolegal investigation staff members; granting rule-making authority; making an appropriation; and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Vruwink [D] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] | Rep. Evan Goyke [D] |
Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Rep. Sondy Pope [D] |
Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] | Rep. Dana Wachs [D] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and Government Operations and take up (Y: 37 N: 54 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-20 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and Government Operations and take up, Ayes 37, Noes 54 |
2014-02-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Vruwink and Kleefisch |
2014-01-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-12-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-12-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-12-11 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2013-12-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2013-11-25 | House | Introduced |