WI AB520 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 813.12 (4) (d) 1m., 813.122 (5) (dm) 1m., 813.123 (5) (d) 1m. and 813.125 (4) (d) 1m. of the statutes; Relating to: permanent restraining orders for victims of sexual assault.
Title
Permanent restraining orders for victims of sexual assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:19 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Dittrich |
2022-02-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2022-01-19 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Dittrich |
2021-10-26 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich |
2021-09-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-09-20 | House | Representative James added as a coauthor |
2021-08-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-08-31 | House | Introduced |