WI AB519 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 893.82 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: service of notice of claim against state officer, employee, or agent.
Title
Service of notice of claim against state officer, employee, or agent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-11-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-11-06 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2017-10-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-10-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-09-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-09-29 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab519 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB519.pdf |