WI AB517 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.1105 (20m) (a) 1.; to amend 66.1106 (1) (d); and to create 66.1105 (20m) (a) 1. b. of the statutes; Relating to: environmental pollution in an environmental remediation tax incremental district. (FE)
Title
Environmental pollution in an environmental remediation tax incremental district. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-24 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2022-01-20 | House | Placed on calendar 1-25-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2022-01-20 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2021-10-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-10-19 | House | Representative Loudenbeck added as a coauthor |
2021-10-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-10-06 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Armstrong |
2021-09-20 | House | Representative Novak added as a coauthor |
2021-09-15 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2021-09-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-08-31 | House | Introduced |