WI AB512 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: a Public Defender Board student loan payment pilot program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
A Public Defender Board student loan payment pilot program, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2019-12-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-11-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-11-22 | House | LRB correction |
2019-10-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-23 | House | Representative Summerfield added as a coauthor |
2019-10-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-10-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab512 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB512.pdf |