WI AB510 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 45.40 (2) (a); and to create 45.40 (2) (d), 45.40 (6) and 45.40 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: health care aid for certain veterans and their family members. (FE)
Title
Health care aid for certain veterans and their family members. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - House - Assembly: Refused to withdraw from the committee on Veterans and Military Affairs (Y: 36 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-09 | House | Refused to withdraw from the committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 36, Noes 61 |
2015-12-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-11-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2015-11-13 | House | Introduced |